+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (82)
On April 20, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 18, 2016
On April 12, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Chambers AM2510 withdrawn
- Presented to Governor on April 12, 2016
- Chambers AM2503 withdrawn
- Chambers AM2504 withdrawn
- Chambers AM2505 withdrawn
- Chambers AM2506 withdrawn
- Chambers AM2507 withdrawn
- Chambers AM2509 withdrawn
- Chambers AM2508 withdrawn
- Chambers AM2511 withdrawn
- Chambers AM2518 withdrawn
- President/Speaker signed
- Chambers AM2512 withdrawn
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
- Passed on Final Reading 45-3-1
- Chambers AM2517 withdrawn
- Chambers AM2516 withdrawn
- Chambers AM2515 withdrawn
On April 6, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On April 5, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Chambers MO265 Bracket until April 20, 2016 filed
- Enrollment and Review ER190 adopted
- Chambers AM2514 pending
- Chambers AM2514 lost
- Chambers AM2501 lost
- Chambers AM2502 withdrawn
- Chambers AM2499 lost
- Chambers MO267 Reconsider the vote to bracket filed
- Chambers MO265 failed
- Chambers MO267 failed
- Chambers MO268 Recommit to Natural Resources Committee filed
- Chambers MO268 failed
- McCollister MO269 Invoke cloture filed
- McCollister MO269 prevailed
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On March 16, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER190 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER190
On March 15, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Chambers AM2499 filed
- McCollister MO206 Invoke cloture filed
- Chambers AM2513 lost
- Chambers AM2513 filed
- Chambers MO207 failed
- Chambers MO207 Reconsider the vote on AM2499 filed
- Chambers AM2499 lost
- Chambers MO205 withdrawn
- Brasch AM2584 lost
- Brasch AM2584 filed
- Chambers AM2498 withdrawn
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Chambers MO205 Reconsider the vote to bracket filed
- Chambers MO204 failed
- Chambers MO204 Bracket until April 20, 2016 filed
- McCollister MO206 prevailed
- Chambers AM2512 filed
- Chambers AM2514 filed
- Chambers AM2509 filed
- Chambers AM2518 filed
- Chambers AM2501 filed
- Chambers AM2516 filed
- Chambers AM2515 filed
- Chambers AM2511 filed
- Chambers AM2510 filed
- Chambers AM2517 filed
- Chambers AM2508 filed
- Chambers AM2507 filed
- Chambers AM2506 filed
- Chambers AM2505 filed
- Chambers AM2504 filed
- Chambers AM2503 filed
- Chambers AM2502 filed
On March 10, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Chambers MO202 Bracket until April 20, 2016 filed
- Chambers MO202 failed
- Chambers MO203 Reconsider the vote to bracket filed
- Chambers MO203 failed
On March 9, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Chambers AM2498 filed
- Chambers MO201 failed
- Chambers MO201 Bracket until April 20, 2016 filed
On February 19, 2016 in the Legislature:
- McCollister priority bill
On February 18, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 21, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 03, 2016
On January 7, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Natural Resources Committee
On January 6, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor