+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 23, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 23, 2018
On April 18, 2018 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0
- Presented to Governor on April 18, 2018
On April 10, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Wayne AM2778 adopted
- Enrollment and Review ER168 adopted
On April 3, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Wayne AM2778 filed
- Enrollment and Review ER168 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER168
On March 28, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Judiciary AM2160 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Wayne AM1623 withdrawn
On February 28, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Judiciary AM2160 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2160
On February 21, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Speaker priority bill
On February 1, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Watermeier name added
On January 24, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Wayne AM1623 filed
On January 9, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 25, 2018
On January 8, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
On January 3, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor