+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 31, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB694 amended into LB86 by AM1199
- Indefinitely postponed
- Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed
On May 24, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed
On March 27, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Appropriations AM983 filed
- Placed on General File with AM983
On March 1, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for March 13, 2019
On January 25, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Appropriations Committee
On January 23, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Sponsor
Vargas
Type:
Primary Sponsor