+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 26, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on May 25, 2021
On May 21, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on May 20, 2021
On May 20, 2021 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2
On May 18, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On May 12, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Linehan AM1433 adopted
- Linehan AM1433 filed
- Enrollment and Review ER72 adopted
On April 27, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File with ER72
- Enrollment and Review ER72 filed
On April 26, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Revenue AM195 adopted
- Pending
On March 17, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Speaker priority bill
On March 2, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Revenue AM195 filed
- Placed on General File with AM195
On January 27, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 05, 2021
On January 22, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Revenue Committee
On January 20, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Votes (4)
May 20, 2021: Final Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Present - Not Voting
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Excused - Not Voting
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
- Raymond Aguilar: Yes
- Eliot Bostar: Yes
- John Cavanaugh: Yes
- Jen Day: Yes
- Michael Flood: Yes
- Terrell McKinney: Yes
- Rich Pahls: Yes
- Rita Sanders: Yes
May 12, 2021: AM 1433 Linehan
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 2
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: Present - Not Voting
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Present - Not Voting
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Excused - Not Voting
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Present - Not Voting
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Present - Not Voting
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Present - Not Voting
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
- Raymond Aguilar: Yes
- Eliot Bostar: Yes
- John Cavanaugh: Yes
- Jen Day: Yes
- Michael Flood: Yes
- Terrell McKinney: Yes
- Rich Pahls: Excused - Not Voting
- Rita Sanders: Yes
April 26, 2021: AM 195 Revenue
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 7
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: Present - Not Voting
- Curt Friesen: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Groene: Excused - Not Voting
- Matt Hansen: Excused - Not Voting
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Present - Not Voting
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Excused - Not Voting
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Excused - Not Voting
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Present - Not Voting
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Present - Not Voting
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Excused - Not Voting
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Excused - Not Voting
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Present - Not Voting
- Raymond Aguilar: Yes
- Eliot Bostar: Excused - Not Voting
- John Cavanaugh: Present - Not Voting
- Jen Day: Yes
- Michael Flood: Yes
- Terrell McKinney: Yes
- Rich Pahls: Yes
- Rita Sanders: Yes
April 26, 2021: ADVANCE TO E&R INITIAL
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 6
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: Present - Not Voting
- Curt Friesen: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Groene: Excused - Not Voting
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Present - Not Voting
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Excused - Not Voting
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Excused - Not Voting
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Present - Not Voting
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Excused - Not Voting
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Excused - Not Voting
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
- Raymond Aguilar: Yes
- Eliot Bostar: Excused - Not Voting
- John Cavanaugh: Present - Not Voting
- Jen Day: Yes
- Michael Flood: Yes
- Terrell McKinney: Yes
- Rich Pahls: Yes
- Rita Sanders: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Linehan
Type:
Primary Sponsor