+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 20, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on May 20, 2015
On May 14, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on May 14, 2015
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-2-0
On May 12, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading with ST40
On May 6, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On May 5, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On April 30, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Judiciary AM885 adopted
On March 24, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Judiciary AM885 filed
- Placed on General File with AM885
On January 28, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 04, 2015
On January 26, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
On January 22, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
ST40
adopted
Judiciary AM885
adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor