+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 2, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017
On April 24, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 24, 2017
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 40-3-6
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
On April 10, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On April 3, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On March 31, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On March 28, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Urban Affairs AM224 adopted
On March 8, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Urban Affairs priority bill
On March 6, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Urban Affairs AM224 filed
- Placed on General File with AM224
On January 23, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 14, 2017
On January 20, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Urban Affairs Committee
On January 18, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor