+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 20, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 5, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On May 27, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB601 amended into LB51 by AM745
On January 26, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 03, 2021
On January 22, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
On January 20, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Sponsor
McKinney
Type:
Primary Sponsor