+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 2, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017
On April 24, 2017 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
- Presented to Governor on April 24, 2017
On April 10, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On April 3, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER35 adopted
On March 31, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER35 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER35
On March 28, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Agriculture AM605 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Brasch AM613 adopted
On March 15, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Brasch AM613 filed
- Agriculture AM605 filed
- Placed on General File with AM605
On March 8, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Agriculture priority bill
On January 20, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 07, 2017
- Referred to Agriculture Committee
On January 18, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Agriculture Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor