+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 8, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on May 08, 2019
On May 2, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on May 02, 2019
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2
On April 25, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On April 23, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER74 adopted
On April 11, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER74 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER74
On April 9, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Education AM381 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On March 20, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Speaker priority bill
On February 27, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Education AM381 filed
- Placed on General File with AM381
On January 24, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Crawford name added
On January 15, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 22, 2019
On January 14, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Linehan name added
- Gragert name added
- Referred to Education Committee
On January 10, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 2, 2019: Final Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Yes
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Present - Not Voting
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Excused - Not Voting
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
April 9, 2019: AM 381 Education
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 6
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Present - Not Voting
- Ernie Chambers: Yes
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Excused - Not Voting
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Present - Not Voting
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Present - Not Voting
- Matt Hansen: Present - Not Voting
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Present - Not Voting
- John McCollister: Excused - Not Voting
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Present - Not Voting
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Present - Not Voting
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Excused - Not Voting
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Excused - Not Voting
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Excused - Not Voting
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Excused - Not Voting
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
April 9, 2019: ADVANCE TO E&R INITIAL
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 5
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Present - Not Voting
- Ernie Chambers: Yes
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Excused - Not Voting
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Present - Not Voting
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Present - Not Voting
- John McCollister: Excused - Not Voting
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Present - Not Voting
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Excused - Not Voting
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Excused - Not Voting
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Excused - Not Voting
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
+ − Sponsors (4)
Blood
Type:
Primary Sponsor