+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 27, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB6 amended into LB387 by AM291
On February 23, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 21, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 29, 2021
On January 13, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Murman name added
On January 12, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Day name added
On January 11, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Brandt name added
- Lindstrom name added
- Referred to Revenue Committee
On January 8, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Gragert name added
On January 7, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction