+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 14, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on March 14, 2022
On March 9, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Wayne name added
- DeBoer explanation of vote
On March 8, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on March 8, 2022
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 42-0-7
On March 2, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On February 28, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Hansen, B. AM1958 adopted
- Enrollment and Review ER107 adopted
On February 22, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Hansen, B. AM1958 filed
On February 16, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER107 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER107
On February 14, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Business and Labor AM301 adopted
On January 5, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On March 29, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Business and Labor AM301 filed
- Placed on General File with AM301
On March 23, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Hunt name withdrawn
On January 25, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Hunt name added
- Notice of hearing for February 01, 2021
On January 22, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Business and Labor Committee
On January 19, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (3)
March 8, 2022: Final Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
February 28, 2022: AM 1958 Hansen, B.
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 2
February 14, 2022: ADVANCE TO E&R INITIAL
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (3)
Business and Labor Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor