+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On April 23, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB548 amended into LB1005 by AM2204
On April 18, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On April 4, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Kolterman AM1758 withdrawn
- Kolterman AM1652 withdrawn
- Kolterman AM1506 withdrawn
- Nebraska Retirement Systems AM2595 lost
- Lindstrom AM1529 withdrawn
- Nebraska Retirement Systems AM2595 pending
- Vargas name added
On March 27, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Nebraska Retirement Systems AM2595 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2595
On February 7, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Nebraska Retirement Systems priority bill
On February 6, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 14, 2018, on AM1758
- Notice of hearing for February 14, 2018, on AM1529
On February 5, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Wayne name added
- Kolterman AM1758 filed
On January 26, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Kolterman AM1652 filed
On January 24, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Lindstrom AM1529 filed
On January 11, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Kolterman AM1506 filed
On January 3, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On January 23, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 23, 2017
On January 20, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee
On January 18, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor