+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 23, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on May 22, 2017
On May 17, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on May 16, 2017
On May 16, 2017 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3
On May 8, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading Second
On May 4, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment
- Hansen AM1320 adopted
- Hansen AM1320 filed
- Returned to Select File for specific amendment
On May 2, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On April 26, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Hansen AM1187 adopted
On April 25, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Hansen AM1187 filed
On April 24, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On April 20, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On February 2, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 20, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 30, 2017
- Referred to Business and Labor Committee
On January 18, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor