+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On August 13, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 8, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On May 31, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB517 amended into LB519 by AM1460
On April 23, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Hunt name added
On February 11, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for March 21, 2019
On February 7, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Bostelman name added
On January 24, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
On January 22, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction