+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 20, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On March 24, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Brewer AM2357 filed
On March 17, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Brewer AM2387 filed
On February 22, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Business and Labor priority bill
On February 15, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Business and Labor AM1620 filed
- Placed on General File with AM1620
On February 2, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Brewer AM1620 filed
On January 5, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On February 24, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Gragert name added
On February 19, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for March 01, 2021
On January 22, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Business and Labor Committee
On January 19, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Sponsors (2)
Brewer
Type:
Primary Sponsor