+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 26, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on May 26, 2015
On May 21, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on May 20, 2015
On May 20, 2015 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1
On May 7, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On May 6, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On April 30, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On April 29, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On March 23, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On February 12, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for March 10, 2015
On January 23, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Education Committee
On January 21, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor