+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 8, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On February 24, 2017 in the Legislature:
- McDonnell name added
On January 24, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 15, 2017
On January 19, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Natural Resources Committee
On January 17, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor