+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 20, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 5, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On April 28, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Slama MO57 Indefinitely postpone bill filed
On March 2, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Groene name added
On February 11, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for March 01, 2021
On February 5, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Lathrop name added
On February 3, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Brewer name added
On January 20, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
On January 15, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Sponsors (4)
Day
Type:
Primary Sponsor