+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 29, 2015 in the Legislature:
On May 28, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on May 27, 2015
On May 26, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on May 21, 2015
On May 21, 2015 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
On May 19, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On May 18, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER121 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On May 6, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER121 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER121
On May 4, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Business and Labor AM1274 adopted
On April 21, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Business and Labor AM1274 filed
- Placed on General File with AM1274
On March 11, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Business and Labor priority bill
On February 2, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for March 09, 2015
On January 22, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Business and Labor Committee
On January 20, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
Enrollment and Review ER121
adopted
Business and Labor AM1274
adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor