+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 31, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB479 amended into LB519 by AM1591
- Indefinitely postponed
- Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed
On May 24, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed
On April 26, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Judiciary AM1473 filed
- Placed on General File with AM1473
On February 11, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for March 15, 2019
On January 24, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
On January 22, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Sponsor
Wishart
Type:
Primary Sponsor