+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 25, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on February 24, 2016
On February 18, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on February 18, 2016
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
On February 10, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On February 8, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Chambers AM1958 adopted
- Enrollment and Review ER152 adopted
On February 4, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Chambers AM1958 filed
On February 1, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER152 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER152
On January 28, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Transportation and Telecommunications AM347 adopted
On January 6, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On February 23, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Transportation and Telecommunications AM347 filed
- Placed on General File with AM347
On January 29, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 09, 2015
On January 22, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
On January 20, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor