+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 20, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 6, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On January 27, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Krist name added
- Kintner name added
- Crawford name added
- Notice of hearing for February 04, 2015
On January 22, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Revenue Committee
On January 20, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction