+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 5, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on May 5, 2021
On April 29, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 29, 2021
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 40-4-5
On April 21, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On April 20, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER53 adopted
On April 9, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER53 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER53
On April 6, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Business and Labor AM550 adopted
On March 17, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Business and Labor AM550 filed
- Placed on General File with AM550
On March 12, 2021 in the Legislature:
- McKinney priority bill
On February 9, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Hunt name added
On February 1, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 08, 2021
On January 20, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Business and Labor Committee
On January 15, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (3)
April 29, 2021: Final Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: No
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Excused - Not Voting
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: No
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: No
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: No
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Present - Not Voting
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Mike Moser: Present - Not Voting
- Dave Murman: Present - Not Voting
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
- Raymond Aguilar: Yes
- Eliot Bostar: Yes
- John Cavanaugh: Yes
- Jen Day: Yes
- Michael Flood: Yes
- Terrell McKinney: Yes
- Rich Pahls: Yes
- Rita Sanders: Yes
April 6, 2021: AM 550 Bus & Labor
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 12
- Absent: 5
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Excused - Not Voting
- Mark Kolterman: Present - Not Voting
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Excused - Not Voting
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Present - Not Voting
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Present - Not Voting
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Present - Not Voting
- Suzanne Geist: Excused - Not Voting
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Present - Not Voting
- Mike McDonnell: Present - Not Voting
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Excused - Not Voting
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Present - Not Voting
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Present - Not Voting
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Present - Not Voting
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
- Raymond Aguilar: Yes
- Eliot Bostar: Present - Not Voting
- John Cavanaugh: Present - Not Voting
- Jen Day: Yes
- Michael Flood: Yes
- Terrell McKinney: Yes
- Rich Pahls: Excused - Not Voting
- Rita Sanders: Yes
April 6, 2021: ADVANCE TO E&R INITIAL
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 5
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Excused - Not Voting
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Excused - Not Voting
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Present - Not Voting
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Present - Not Voting
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Present - Not Voting
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Present - Not Voting
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Excused - Not Voting
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Present - Not Voting
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Excused - Not Voting
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
- Raymond Aguilar: Yes
- Eliot Bostar: Yes
- John Cavanaugh: Yes
- Jen Day: Yes
- Michael Flood: Yes
- Terrell McKinney: Yes
- Rich Pahls: Excused - Not Voting
- Rita Sanders: Yes
+ − Sponsors (2)
McKinney
Type:
Primary Sponsor