+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 20, 2016 in the Legislature:
On March 30, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on March 30, 2016
On March 24, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
- Kolterman AM2546 withdrawn
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3
- President/Speaker signed
- Presented to Governor on March 24, 2016
On March 15, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Kolterman AM2546 filed
On March 10, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On March 7, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Kolterman name added
- Kolowski name added
- Groene name added
- Davis name added
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Kolterman AM2344 adopted
- Enrollment and Review ER174 adopted
On March 3, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Kolterman AM2344 filed
On February 29, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER174 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER174
On February 25, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Mello AM1815 withdrawn
- Kolterman AM2282 adopted
- Nebraska Retirement Systems AM1979 adopted
On February 24, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Kolterman AM2282 filed
On February 18, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Nebraska Retirement Systems AM1979 filed
- Placed on General File with AM1979
On February 11, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Nebraska Retirement Systems priority bill
On January 14, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 25, 2016, on AM1815
On January 7, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Mello name added
- Mello AM1815 filed
On January 6, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On May 29, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB447 amended into LB448 by AM1555
On February 5, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for March 05, 2015
On January 22, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee
On January 20, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction