+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 23, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB244 amended into LB444 by AM842
On May 2, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017
On April 24, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 24, 2017
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 31-8-10
- Lindstrom FA66 withdrawn
- Lindstrom FA66 filed
- Motion to return to Select File withdrawn
On April 11, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading with ST14
On April 10, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Erdman AM982 withdrawn
- Enrollment and Review ER36 adopted
- Erdman AM982 filed
- Bolz AM842 filed
- Bolz AM842 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On March 31, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER36 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER36
On March 29, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Ebke FA50 adopted
- Ebke FA50 filed
- Judiciary AM467 adopted
On March 8, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Walz priority bill
On March 7, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Judiciary AM467 filed
- Placed on General File with AM467
On January 30, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for March 03, 2017
On January 19, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
On January 17, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor