+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 10, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On March 18, 2015 in the Legislature:
- McCollister name added
On February 19, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Groene name added
On February 6, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for March 12, 2015
On January 22, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
On January 20, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor