+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On August 13, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 8, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On March 25, 2019 in the Legislature:
- General Affairs AM244 filed
- Placed on General File with AM244
On February 5, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Hunt name added
On February 4, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Albrecht name added
On January 28, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 04, 2019
On January 18, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Rereferred to General Affairs Committee
On January 14, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Appropriations Committee
On January 10, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction