+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 20, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 5, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On January 26, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 04, 2021
On January 20, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
On January 15, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Hansen, M. name added
On January 14, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Sponsor
Morfeld
Type:
Primary Sponsor