+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 27, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB6 amended into LB387 by AM291
On May 26, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Correction
- Approved by Governor on May 25, 2021
On May 19, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on May 19, 2021
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
- Cavanaugh, M. MO76 failed
- Cavanaugh, M. MO76 Recommit to the Revenue Committee filed
On March 23, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On March 22, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Wayne name added
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On March 12, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On March 10, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Revenue AM291 adopted
- Lindstrom name added
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On March 3, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Arch name added
On February 25, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Revenue AM291 filed
- Placed on General File with AM291
On February 5, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Slama name added
On February 3, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Hansen, B. name added
On January 21, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Blood name added
- Notice of hearing for January 29, 2021
On January 20, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Revenue Committee
On January 15, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Gragert priority bill
On January 14, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (4)
May 19, 2021: MO 76 Cavanaugh, M. - RECOMMIT TO COMMITTEE
- Nays: 48
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: No
- Curt Friesen: No
- Mike Groene: No
- Matt Hansen: No
- Robert Hilkemann: No
- Dan Hughes: No
- Mark Kolterman: No
- Brett Lindstrom: No
- John McCollister: No
- Adam Morfeld: No
- Patty Pansing Brooks: No
- John Stinner: No
- Matt Williams: No
- Joni Albrecht: No
- Carol Blood: No
- Bruce Bostelman: No
- Tom Brewer: Excused - Not Voting
- Tom Briese: No
- Steve Erdman: No
- Suzanne Geist: No
- Steve Halloran: No
- Mike Hilgers: No
- Lou Ann Linehan: No
- John Lowe: No
- Mike McDonnell: No
- Tony Vargas: No
- Lynne Walz: No
- Justin Wayne: No
- Anna Wishart: No
- Robert Clements: No
- John Arch: No
- Tom Brandt: No
- Machaela Cavanaugh: No
- Wendy DeBoer: No
- Myron Dorn: No
- Tim Gragert: No
- Megan Hunt: No
- Mike Moser: No
- Dave Murman: No
- Julie Slama: No
- Ben Hansen: No
- Raymond Aguilar: No
- Eliot Bostar: No
- John Cavanaugh: No
- Jen Day: No
- Michael Flood: No
- Terrell McKinney: No
- Rich Pahls: No
- Rita Sanders: No
May 19, 2021: Final Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Excused - Not Voting
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
- Raymond Aguilar: Yes
- Eliot Bostar: Yes
- John Cavanaugh: Yes
- Jen Day: Yes
- Michael Flood: Yes
- Terrell McKinney: Yes
- Rich Pahls: Yes
- Rita Sanders: Yes
March 10, 2021: AM 291 Revenue
- Yeas: 45
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Excused - Not Voting
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Present - Not Voting
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Excused - Not Voting
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
- Raymond Aguilar: Yes
- Eliot Bostar: Excused - Not Voting
- John Cavanaugh: Yes
- Jen Day: Yes
- Michael Flood: Yes
- Terrell McKinney: Yes
- Rich Pahls: Yes
- Rita Sanders: Yes
March 10, 2021: ADVANCE TO E&R INITIAL
- Yeas: 45
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Excused - Not Voting
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Excused - Not Voting
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
- Raymond Aguilar: Yes
- Eliot Bostar: Excused - Not Voting
- John Cavanaugh: Yes
- Jen Day: Yes
- Michael Flood: Yes
- Terrell McKinney: Yes
- Rich Pahls: Yes
- Rita Sanders: Yes