+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 10, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on May 10, 2017
On May 4, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on May 04, 2017
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1
- Chambers FA74 withdrawn
- Chambers FA74 filed
- Motion to return to Select File withdrawn
On May 2, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On April 26, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On April 24, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On April 20, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Urban Affairs AM49 adopted
On February 1, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Urban Affairs AM49 filed
- Placed on General File with AM49
On January 23, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 31, 2017
On January 17, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Urban Affairs Committee
On January 13, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor