+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 29, 2015 in the Legislature:
On May 19, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on May 19, 2015
On May 14, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on May 14, 2015
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
On May 12, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading with ST38
On May 6, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Davis AM1574 lost
- Davis AM1574 filed
- Davis AM1518 withdrawn
On May 5, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Davis AM1518 pending
- Johnson AM1520 adopted
- Johnson AM1478 withdrawn
- Enrollment and Review ER90 adopted
On May 4, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Davis AM1518 filed
- Johnson AM1520 filed
On May 1, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Johnson AM1478 filed
On April 28, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER90 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER90
On April 21, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Johnson AM1193 adopted
- Agriculture AM1151 pending
- Johnson AM1194 adopted
- Agriculture AM1151 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On April 13, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Johnson AM1194 filed
- Johnson AM1193 filed
On April 8, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Agriculture AM1151 filed
- Placed on General File with AM1151
On March 12, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Agriculture priority bill
On January 30, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 17, 2015
On January 16, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Agriculture Committee
On January 15, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (9)
ST38
adopted
Davis AM1574
lost
Davis AM1518
withdrawn
Johnson AM1520
adopted
Johnson AM1478
withdrawn
Enrollment and Review ER90
adopted
Johnson AM1194
adopted
Johnson AM1193
adopted
Agriculture AM1151
adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor