+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 19, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on March 18, 2015
On March 12, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on March 12, 2015
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 39-2-8
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
On March 5, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On March 3, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Howard AM372 filed
- Howard AM372 adopted
- Kintner FA28 filed
- Kintner FA28 lost
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On February 19, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On February 18, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On February 10, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 15, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 29, 2015
On January 12, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Health and Human Services Committee
On January 8, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
Howard AM372
adopted
Kintner FA28
lost
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor