+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 15, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on May 12, 2017
On May 11, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on May 11, 2017
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 42-0-7
On May 9, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On May 8, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Howard AM1357 adopted
- Howard AM1357 filed
- Enrollment and Review ER22 adopted
On March 23, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER22 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER22
On March 22, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Chambers MO65 failed
- Chambers MO66 Reconsider the vote to indefinitely postpone filed
- Chambers MO66 withdrawn
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On March 21, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Chambers MO65 pending
- Chambers MO65 Indefinitely postpone filed
- Krist AM703 adopted
- Krist AM703 filed
On March 13, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On March 9, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Health and Human Services priority bill
On January 20, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Scheer name withdrawn
On January 18, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Riepe name added
- Notice of hearing for January 25, 2017
On January 17, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Health and Human Services Committee
On January 12, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor