+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 7, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on March 03, 2016
On February 29, 2016 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3
- Presented to Governor on February 29, 2016
On February 19, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On February 17, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER158 adopted
On February 4, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER158 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER158
On February 3, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Urban Affairs AM323 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Crawford AM556 adopted
On January 6, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On May 6, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Crawford AM556 filed
On February 18, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Urban Affairs AM323 filed
- Placed on General File with AM323
On January 26, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 03, 2015
On January 16, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Urban Affairs Committee
On January 15, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
Crawford AM556
pending
Urban Affairs AM323
pending
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor