+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On August 13, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 8, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On January 24, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 31, 2019
On January 22, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Gragert name added
On January 17, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Revenue Committee
On January 15, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Sponsors (2)
Linehan
Type:
Primary Sponsor