+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 9, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 6, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On February 3, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Garrett name added
On February 2, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for March 09, 2015
On January 16, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Business and Labor Committee
On January 15, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor