+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 20, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 5, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On March 24, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER26 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER26
On March 23, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Bostelman name added
On March 22, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Education AM298 adopted
- Pahls AM736 filed
- Pahls AM736 withdrawn
- Hunt AM735 filed
- Hunt AM735 lost
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On March 15, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Education AM298 filed
- Placed on General File with AM298
On March 10, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Albrecht priority bill
On February 11, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 23, 2021
On January 14, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Education Committee
On January 12, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (3)
March 22, 2021: AM 298 Education
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 12
- Absent: 5
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: Excused - Not Voting
- Curt Friesen: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Present - Not Voting
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Present - Not Voting
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Present - Not Voting
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Excused - Not Voting
- Tom Briese: Excused - Not Voting
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Present - Not Voting
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Present - Not Voting
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Excused - Not Voting
- Tom Brandt: Present - Not Voting
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Present - Not Voting
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Excused - Not Voting
- Raymond Aguilar: Yes
- Eliot Bostar: Present - Not Voting
- John Cavanaugh: Present - Not Voting
- Jen Day: Yes
- Michael Flood: Present - Not Voting
- Terrell McKinney: Yes
- Rich Pahls: Present - Not Voting
- Rita Sanders: Yes
March 22, 2021: AM 735 Hunt
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 6
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: Excused - Not Voting
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: No
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: No
- Dan Hughes: No
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: No
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Excused - Not Voting
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Present - Not Voting
- Matt Williams: Present - Not Voting
- Joni Albrecht: No
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: No
- Tom Brewer: Excused - Not Voting
- Tom Briese: Excused - Not Voting
- Steve Erdman: No
- Suzanne Geist: No
- Steve Halloran: No
- Mike Hilgers: No
- Lou Ann Linehan: No
- John Lowe: No
- Mike McDonnell: No
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: No
- John Arch: Excused - Not Voting
- Tom Brandt: No
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: No
- Tim Gragert: No
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Mike Moser: No
- Dave Murman: No
- Julie Slama: No
- Ben Hansen: No
- Raymond Aguilar: No
- Eliot Bostar: Present - Not Voting
- John Cavanaugh: Yes
- Jen Day: Yes
- Michael Flood: No
- Terrell McKinney: Yes
- Rich Pahls: Excused - Not Voting
- Rita Sanders: No
March 22, 2021: ADVANCE TO E&R INITIAL
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 6
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: Excused - Not Voting
- Curt Friesen: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Present - Not Voting
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Present - Not Voting
- Adam Morfeld: Excused - Not Voting
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Present - Not Voting
- Matt Williams: Present - Not Voting
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Present - Not Voting
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Excused - Not Voting
- Tom Briese: Excused - Not Voting
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Present - Not Voting
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Excused - Not Voting
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Present - Not Voting
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: No
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
- Raymond Aguilar: Yes
- Eliot Bostar: Present - Not Voting
- John Cavanaugh: Present - Not Voting
- Jen Day: Yes
- Michael Flood: Yes
- Terrell McKinney: Yes
- Rich Pahls: Excused - Not Voting
- Rita Sanders: Yes
+ − Sponsors (2)
Albrecht
Type:
Primary Sponsor