+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 6, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on March 05, 2015
On February 27, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on February 27, 2015
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
On February 20, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On February 19, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER30 adopted
On February 12, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER30 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER30
On February 10, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Urban Affairs AM122 adopted
On February 4, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Urban Affairs AM122 filed
- Placed on General File with AM122
On January 26, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 03, 2015
On January 15, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Urban Affairs Committee
On January 14, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
Enrollment and Review ER30
adopted
Urban Affairs AM122
adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor