+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 14, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 14, 2021
On April 12, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 12, 2021
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3
On April 7, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On April 6, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On March 30, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On March 29, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On February 19, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On February 9, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Murman name added
On January 28, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 05, 2021
On January 13, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Health and Human Services Committee
On January 11, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (2)
April 12, 2021: Final Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Present - Not Voting
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Excused - Not Voting
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Mike Moser: Excused - Not Voting
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
- Raymond Aguilar: Yes
- Eliot Bostar: Yes
- John Cavanaugh: Yes
- Jen Day: Yes
- Michael Flood: Yes
- Terrell McKinney: Yes
- Rich Pahls: Yes
- Rita Sanders: Yes
March 29, 2021: ADVANCE TO E&R INITIAL
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Present - Not Voting
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Present - Not Voting
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Excused - Not Voting
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Present - Not Voting
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Excused - Not Voting
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Excused - Not Voting
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
- Raymond Aguilar: Yes
- Eliot Bostar: Yes
- John Cavanaugh: Yes
- Jen Day: Yes
- Michael Flood: Yes
- Terrell McKinney: Yes
- Rich Pahls: Yes
- Rita Sanders: Yes
+ − Sponsors (2)
Williams
Type:
Primary Sponsor