+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 30, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on May 29, 2019
On May 24, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on May 23, 2019
On May 23, 2019 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1
On April 15, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On April 10, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Lindstrom AM1137 adopted
- Enrollment and Review ER60 adopted
On April 4, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Lindstrom AM1137 filed
On March 27, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER60 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER60
On March 25, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Revenue AM536 adopted
On March 20, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Speaker priority bill
On March 13, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Revenue AM536 filed
- Placed on General File with AM536
On February 13, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 22, 2019
On January 15, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Revenue Committee
On January 11, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (4)
May 23, 2019: Final Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Yes
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Excused - Not Voting
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
April 10, 2019: AM 1137 Lindstrom
- Yeas: 46
- Present/NV: 3
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Yes
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Present - Not Voting
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Present - Not Voting
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Present - Not Voting
March 25, 2019: AM 536 Revenue
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 3
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Excused - Not Voting
- Ernie Chambers: Excused - Not Voting
- Sue Crawford: Present - Not Voting
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Present - Not Voting
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: No
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Excused - Not Voting
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Present - Not Voting
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Present - Not Voting
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Present - Not Voting
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
March 25, 2019: ADVANCE TO E&R INITIAL
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 3
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Excused - Not Voting
- Ernie Chambers: Excused - Not Voting
- Sue Crawford: Present - Not Voting
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: No
- Matt Hansen: Present - Not Voting
- Robert Hilkemann: Present - Not Voting
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Excused - Not Voting
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Present - Not Voting
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Present - Not Voting
- Robert Clements: Present - Not Voting
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Present - Not Voting
+ − Sponsor
Lindstrom
Type:
Primary Sponsor