+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 20, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 6, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On February 12, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Coash name added
On January 27, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 12, 2015
On January 15, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Revenue Committee
On January 13, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor