+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 21, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on May 21, 2021
On May 20, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on May 19, 2021
On May 19, 2021 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 41-0-8
On May 12, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On May 10, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER71 adopted
On April 27, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER71 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER71
On April 26, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Nebraska Retirement Systems AM880 adopted
On April 8, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Nebraska Retirement Systems AM880 filed
- Placed on General File with AM880
On February 16, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for March 03, 2021
On January 12, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee
On January 8, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 19, 2021: Final Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Absent: 8
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Excused - Not Voting
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Excused - Not Voting
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Excused - Not Voting
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Excused - Not Voting
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Excused - Not Voting
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
- Raymond Aguilar: Excused - Not Voting
- Eliot Bostar: Yes
- John Cavanaugh: Yes
- Jen Day: Excused - Not Voting
- Michael Flood: Yes
- Terrell McKinney: Yes
- Rich Pahls: Excused - Not Voting
- Rita Sanders: Yes
April 26, 2021: AM 880 Retirement
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 2
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: Present - Not Voting
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Present - Not Voting
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Excused - Not Voting
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Present - Not Voting
- Lou Ann Linehan: Present - Not Voting
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Present - Not Voting
- Justin Wayne: Present - Not Voting
- Anna Wishart: Excused - Not Voting
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Present - Not Voting
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
- Raymond Aguilar: Yes
- Eliot Bostar: Yes
- John Cavanaugh: Yes
- Jen Day: Yes
- Michael Flood: Yes
- Terrell McKinney: Yes
- Rich Pahls: Yes
- Rita Sanders: Yes
April 26, 2021: ADVANCE TO E&R INITIAL
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 2
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: Present - Not Voting
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Present - Not Voting
- Adam Morfeld: Excused - Not Voting
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Present - Not Voting
- Justin Wayne: Present - Not Voting
- Anna Wishart: Excused - Not Voting
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Present - Not Voting
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
- Raymond Aguilar: Yes
- Eliot Bostar: Yes
- John Cavanaugh: Yes
- Jen Day: Yes
- Michael Flood: Yes
- Terrell McKinney: Yes
- Rich Pahls: Yes
- Rita Sanders: Yes
+ − Sponsor
McDonnell
Type:
Primary Sponsor