+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On August 13, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 8, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On March 1, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for March 25, 2019
- Notice of hearing for March 18, 2019 (cancel)
On February 8, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for March 18, 2019
On January 14, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Business and Labor Committee
On January 10, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Sponsor
Briese
Type:
Primary Sponsor