+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 13, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on March 12, 2019
On March 7, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on March 07, 2019
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2
On March 5, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On March 1, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On February 19, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On February 8, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On February 5, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 31, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Erdman name added
On January 23, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 30, 2019
On January 15, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Revenue Committee
On January 11, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2019: Final Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 2
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Excused - Not Voting
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Excused - Not Voting
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
February 8, 2019: ADVANCE TO E&R INITIAL
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 3
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Present - Not Voting
- Ernie Chambers: Present - Not Voting
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Present - Not Voting
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Excused - Not Voting
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Present - Not Voting
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Excused - Not Voting
- Mike McDonnell: Present - Not Voting
- Dan Quick: Present - Not Voting
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Excused - Not Voting
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
+ − Sponsors (2)
Friesen
Type:
Primary Sponsor