+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On August 18, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on August 17, 2020
On August 12, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3
- Presented to Governor on August 12, 2020
- President/Speaker signed
On July 23, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading Second
On July 21, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment
- Brewer AM3003 adopted
- Returned to Select File for specific amendment
On July 20, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Brewer AM3003 filed
On February 10, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Walz name added
On January 27, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On January 24, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER137 adopted
On January 14, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Hilgers name added
- Enrollment and Review ER137 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER137
On January 13, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Erdman name added
- Murman name added
- Brewer AM2064 adopted
- Slama name added
- Hunt name added
- Halloran name added
- McCollister name added
- Quick name added
On January 10, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Wayne name added
- Brewer AM2064 filed
On January 9, 2020 in the Legislature:
- La Grone name added
On January 8, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On May 16, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On March 19, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Lowe priority bill
On February 6, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Hansen, B. name added
On January 30, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 07, 2019
On January 28, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Lindstrom name added
On January 16, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Arch name added
- Pansing Brooks name added
On January 15, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Revenue Committee
On January 11, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statements (4)
+ − Votes (5)
August 12, 2020: Final Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 3
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Excused - Not Voting
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Excused - Not Voting
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Excused - Not Voting
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
July 21, 2020: AM 3003 Brewer - RETURN TO SELECT FILE
- Yeas: 47
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Yes
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Excused - Not Voting
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Present - Not Voting
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
July 21, 2020: AM 3003 Brewer
- Yeas: 45
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Yes
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Present - Not Voting
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Excused - Not Voting
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Present - Not Voting
- Anna Wishart: Present - Not Voting
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
January 13, 2020: AM 2064 Brewer
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Excused - Not Voting
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Excused - Not Voting
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Excused - Not Voting
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: No
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
January 13, 2020: ADVANCE TO E&R INITIAL
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 3
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Excused - Not Voting
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Excused - Not Voting
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Excused - Not Voting
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
+ − Sponsors (15)
Brewer
Type:
Primary Sponsor