+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 20, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 5, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On April 12, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 20, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Brandt name added
On January 15, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 25, 2021
On January 11, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Education Committee
On January 8, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Hunt name added
On January 7, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction