+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On August 13, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 8, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On May 23, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On February 11, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 27, 2019
On January 14, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
On January 10, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Sponsor
Pansing Brooks
Type:
Primary Sponsor