+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 8, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on March 07, 2017
On March 3, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on March 03, 2017
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 44-3-2
On February 24, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On February 23, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On February 21, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On February 16, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On January 19, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 10, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 17, 2017
- Referred to Urban Affairs Committee
On January 6, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Urban Affairs Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor