+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 20, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 5, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On February 10, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 18, 2021
On January 11, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Health and Human Services Committee
On January 8, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Hunt name added
On January 7, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
McCollister
Type:
Primary Sponsor