+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 21, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on March 21, 2019
On March 18, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Hansen, M. explanation of vote
- Presented to Governor on March 15, 2019
On March 15, 2019 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 41-0-8
On March 12, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On March 7, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER41 adopted
On February 28, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER41 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER41
On February 21, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Lathrop FA13 adopted
- Lathrop FA13 filed
On February 19, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 17, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 25, 2019
On January 14, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
On January 10, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (3)
March 15, 2019: Final Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 6
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Excused - Not Voting
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Present - Not Voting
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Excused - Not Voting
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Excused - Not Voting
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Present - Not Voting
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Excused - Not Voting
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Excused - Not Voting
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Excused - Not Voting
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
February 21, 2019: FA 13 Lathrop
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 16
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Yes
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Present - Not Voting
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Present - Not Voting
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Present - Not Voting
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Present - Not Voting
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Present - Not Voting
- Carol Blood: Present - Not Voting
- Bruce Bostelman: Present - Not Voting
- Tom Brewer: Present - Not Voting
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Present - Not Voting
- Suzanne Geist: Present - Not Voting
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Present - Not Voting
- John Lowe: Present - Not Voting
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Excused - Not Voting
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Present - Not Voting
- Wendy DeBoer: Present - Not Voting
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Present - Not Voting
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
February 21, 2019: ADVANCE TO E&R INITIAL
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 18
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Yes
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Present - Not Voting
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Groene: Present - Not Voting
- Matt Hansen: Present - Not Voting
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Present - Not Voting
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Present - Not Voting
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Present - Not Voting
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Present - Not Voting
- Carol Blood: Present - Not Voting
- Bruce Bostelman: Present - Not Voting
- Tom Brewer: Present - Not Voting
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Present - Not Voting
- Suzanne Geist: Present - Not Voting
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Present - Not Voting
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Present - Not Voting
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Excused - Not Voting
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Present - Not Voting
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Present - Not Voting
+ − Sponsor
Lathrop
Type:
Primary Sponsor